our principal's
Honoring the legacy of our past principal, whose vision shaped our institution.
S.Balwant Singh
01-05-1970 to 22-06-1972
S. Mohan Singh Johal
22-06-1972 to 27-07-1973
Sh. Balvir Singh Verma
12-11-1973 to 30-06-1975
Dr. Randhir Singh Chand
12-12-1975 to 14-05-1976
s. Harnarinder Singh Raja
21-06-1976 to 31-10-1977
S. Balwant Singh
08-11-1977 to 31-10-1987
S. Veer Singh Randhawa
18-12-1987 to 31-03-2004
S. Amritpal Singh Toor
01-04-2004 to 01-10-2004
Dr. Jaspal Singh
02-10-2004 to 30-09-2019
Sh. Ashok Kumar Sharma (co-ordinator)
29-01-2020 to 30-09-2020
Dr. Charanjit Kaur (Offi. Principal)
06-10-2020 to 17-07-2021
Sh. Prabal Kumar Joshi (offi. Principal)
21-07-2021 to till now
Expert. Award-Winning.
Our educators are among the best in the world. Come meet us!